MS SC687 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Ann Coleman Thames Of Brandon, Mississippi, Upon Her Selection As One Of The Mississippi Business Journal's "fifty Leading Business Women For 2009," And Upon Being Selected Among The Honorees As One Of The Top Ten Finalists For 2009 Business Woman Of The Year, And Applauding Her Meritorious Service To The State Of Mississippi In Her Role As Bureau Director For The Mississippi Department Of Mental Health Upon The Occasion Of Her Retirement On April 30, 2010.
Title
Recognize Ann Coleman Thames, MS Business Journal leading business woman, upon retirement from MS Department of Mental Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Carl Gordon [D] | Sen. Billy Hewes [R] | Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R] | Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-04-20 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-20 | Adopted As Amended | |
2010-04-20 | Amended | |
2010-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-26 | Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Rules |