MS SC682 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Powerful Musical Talent Of Mccomb, Mississippi's La'porsha Renae Jennings And Congratulating Her For Her Outstanding Performance On The "american Idol" Television Production.
Title
Congratulate La'Porsha Renae Jennings for outstanding performance on "American Idol" television production.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |