MS SC678 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Clay County Alumnae Chapter Of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., For 30 Years Of Charitable And Public Service.
Title
Commend Clay County Alumnae Chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority on 30th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Turner-Ford [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |