MS SC677 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2015-2016 Jackson Academy "lady Raider" Basketball Team And Head Coach Jan Sojourner For Winning The Mais Aaaa State Championship And For The Mais Overall State Championship.
Title
Commend Jackson Academy "Lady Raider" Basketball Team and Coach Jan Sojourner for winning MAIS AAAA and Overall Championships.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |