MS SC673 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Accomplishments Of Dr. James Anderson And Congratulating Him Upon Being Honored At Healthcare Heroes Hosted By The Mississippi Business Journal.
Title
Congratulate Dr. James Anderson upon being honored as a Healthcare Hero.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-29 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |