MS SC663 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Memorialize And Commemorate The Bicentennial Anniversary Of The Extension Of The Mississippi Eastern Boundary Line By Act Of Congress On March 2, 1819, To Include Present-day Jackson County And The Port Of Pascagoula.
Title
Commemorate the Bicentennial of the extension of the Mississippi eastern boundary to include Jackson County and Port of Pascagoula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-29 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |