MS SC663 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Newton High School "lady Tigers" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Crandal Porter For Winning The Mhsaa Class 2a State Championship And For Their Outstanding 2009-2010 Season.
Title
Commend Newton High School "Lady Tigers" Girls Basketball Team for winning MHSAA Class 2A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] | Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-24 | Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-17 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-17 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-17 | Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Referred To Rules |