MS SC661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating And Extending The Best Wishes Of The Mississippi Legislature To Barbara M. Westerfield Upon The Occasion Of Her Retirement As Director Of Student Records And Registrar At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center, And Express Warmest Wishes For Continued Success In All Of Her Future Endeavors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend Barbara Westerfield on her retirement as Director of Student Records and Registrar at UMMC.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HouseAdopted
2019-03-21HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-20SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-20SenateAdopted
2019-03-19SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback