MS SC661 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating 9-year-old Mississippi Golfer Emerson Blair From West Point For Winning The Usga "drive, Chip And Putt Championship" For Her Age Group At Augusta National Golf Course On April 3, 2016.
Title
Congratulate Emerson Blair for winning the USGA "Drive, Chip and Putt Championship" at Augusta National Golf Course.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Turner-Ford [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Russell Jolly [D] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-13 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-13 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-13 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |