MS SC661 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Acknowledge That March 30, 2015, Is "national Doctors' Day" And To Recognize The Service Of The Doctors Of The Day Serving The Mississippi Legislature During The 2015 Regular Session.
Title
Acknowledge "National Doctors' Day" in Mississippi and recognize service of Doctors of the Day during the 2015 Regular Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |