MS SC657 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Hartfield Academy "hawks" Girls Volleyball Team For Winning The Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools State Championship And Recognizing Head Coach Morgan Mcneely For Being Selected As Mississippi Association Of Independent Schools "coach Of The Year."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend Hartfield Academy "Hawks" Girls Volleyball Team for winning MAIS State Championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HouseAdopted
2019-03-21HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-20SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-20SenateAdopted
2019-03-19SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback