MS SC657 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Horn Lake High School "lady Eagles" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Janna Lyons For Winning Their First Mhsaa Class 6a State Championship And For Their Outstanding 2009-2010 Season.
Title
Commend Horn Lake High School "Lady Eagles" Basketball Team for winning first girls Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-17 | Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Referred To Rules |