MS SC656 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Joining The University Of Mississippi In Commemorating The 50th Anniversary Of The 1968 "mule Train-poor People's Campaign March" From Marks, Mississippi, To Washington, D.c.
Title
Join University of Mississippi in commemorating the 50th Anniversary of the 1968 "Mule Train" March from Marks to Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |