MS SC656 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Civic Contributions, Charity And Advocacy For Those In Poverty Exemplified By Annie Lee Burt Of Jackson, Mississippi, And Extending The Thanks Of The Legislature.
Title
Commend civic contributions and advocacy of Annie Lee Burt of Jackson, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-29 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |