MS SC655 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Cathy L. Northington As The New Chief Operating Officer Of The Mississippi Economic Council Representing The Statewide Business Community.
Title
Recognize Cathy Northington as COO of Mississippi Economic Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-24 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |