MS SC651 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Professional Law Enforcement Service Of Leake County Sheriff Greg Waggoner On The Occasion Of His Retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend law enforcement service of Leake County Sheriff Greg Waggoner on his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-22HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-22HouseAdopted
2019-03-21HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-20SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-20SenateAdopted
2019-03-19SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback