MS SC651 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing September 2016 As "pain Awareness Month In Mississippi" To Bring Awareness For People In Pain.
Title
Recognizing September 2016 as "Pain Awareness Month in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-07 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |