MS SC650 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Welcoming Nasa Astronaut Stephanie D. Wilson To The State Of Mississippi On The Occasion Of The Partners For Stennis Space Center Capitol Day.
Title
Welcome NASA Astronaut Stephanie D. Wilson on Stennis Space Center Capitol Day March 21, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |