MS SC649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating July 13, 2018, As "collector Car Appreciation Day In Mississippi" And Recognizing That The Collection And Restoration Of Historic And Classic Cars Is An Important Part Of Preserving The Technological Achievements And Cultural Heritage Of The United States.
Title
Designate July 13, 2018, as "Collector Car Appreciation Day in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |