MS SC648 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Lasting Legacy And Civic Contributions Of Mississippi Sports Hall Of Fame Inductee And Award-winning Murrah High School "lady Mustangs" Girls Basketball Coach Anna Jackson.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize legacy of award-winning Murrah "Lady Mustangs" Girls Basketball Coach Anna Jackson.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-21HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-21HouseAdopted
2019-03-20HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-20HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-19SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-19SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-19SenateAdopted
2019-03-14SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-14SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback