MS SC648 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Legacy Of Mississippi Civil Rights Pioneer Myrlie Evers-williams.
Title
Remember legacy of Mississippi Civil Rights Pioneer Myrlie Evers-Williams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-23 | Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-18 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-18 | Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-09 | Referred To Rules |