MS SC646 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The 50th Anniversary Of The Vietnam War And Recognizing That March 29, 2017, Is Vietnam Veterans Day In Mississippi.
Title
Commemorate the 50th Anniversary of the Vietnam War and recognize that March 29, 2017, is Vietnam Veterans Day in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |