MS SC639 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy And Service Of Honorable Larry Houchins On The Occasion Of His Retirement After 37 Years As Executive Director Of The Mississippi Bar.
Title
Recognize legacy and service of Honorable Larry Houchins on occasion of retirement as Executive Director of The Mississippi Bar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |