MS SC636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Ole Miss Men's Basketball Coach Kermit Davis As Southeastern Conference (sec) "coach Of The Year" And Team Members Breein Tyree And Terence Davis For All-sec Honors.
Title
Recognize Ole Miss Men's Basketball Coach Kermit Davis as SEC "Coach of the Year."
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |