MS SC627 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Former State Aid Engineer Joe Ralph Clark Of Summit, Mississippi.
Title
Extend condolences of Legislature to family of former State Aid Engineer Joe Clark of Summit, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Rules |