MS SC623 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Charitable Service And National Leadership Of Reverend Dr. Jerry Young, Pastor Of New Hope Baptist Church And President Of The General Missionary Baptist State Convention Of Mississippi.
Title
Commend service of Reverend Dr. Jerry Young, President of General Missionary Baptist State Convention of Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-26 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-26 | Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-02-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-25 | Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-19 | Referred To Rules |