MS SC622 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The University System Leadership Of Commissioner Of Higher Education Dr. Glenn Boyce Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize leadership of Commissioner of Higher Education Dr. Glenn Boyce on occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. Tammy Witherspoon [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |