MS SC622 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Madison-ridgeland Academy "lady Patriots" Basketball Team And Coach Stephen Force For Winning The Mais Aaa State Championship And For The Mais Overall State Championship.
Title
Commend MRA "Lady Patriots" Basketball Team and Coach Stephen Force for winning MAIS AAA and Overall State Championships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |