MS SC621 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Lamar School "lady Raiders" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Josh Sherer For Winning Their First Overall Mais Tournament Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend Lamar School "Lady Raiders" Girls Basketball Team for winning first Overall MAIS Tournament Championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-25SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-19HouseImmediate Release
2019-03-19HouseAdopted
2019-03-14HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-13HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-12SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-12SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-12SenateAdopted
2019-03-11SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-06SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback