MS SC620 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Heritage Academy "patriots" Boys Basketball Team And Coach Russ Whiteside For Winning The Mais Overall Championship, Their First State Championship In The School's History.
Title
Commend Heritage Academy "Patriots" Boys Basketball Team for winning first State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |