MS SC617 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The H.w. Byers High School "lady Lions" Girls Basketball Team And Coach Jason Thompson For Making Mississippi Basketball History By Winning Their Fourth Consecutive Mhsaa State Championship.
Title
Commend H.W. Byers High School "Lady Lions" Basketball Team for historic 4-peat State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Stone [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-25 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-25 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |