MS SC613 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Sports Legacy Of Ole Miss And Natchez High School Football Star Paige Cothren And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Pay tribute to sports legacy of Ole Miss football star Paige Cothren and extend the condolences of the Legislature on his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |