MS SC609 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Velma Jackson High School "falcons" Boys Basketball Team And Coach Anthony Carlyle For Winning Their First State Title In School History.
Title
Commend Velma Jackson High School "Falcons" Boys Basketball Team for first State Title in school history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |