MS SC603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Award-winning Career Of Jackson State University "sonic Boom Of The South" Longtime Band Director Dowell Taylor.
Title
Recognize award-winning career of JSU "Sonic Boom of the South" Band Director Dowell Taylor.
Sponsors
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-01 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |