MS SC601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Condolences Of The Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Former Mississippi Representative Alvin Endt Of Ocean Springs, Mississippi, And Commending His Public Service.
Title
Commend life of former Mississippi Representative Alvin Endt of Ocean Springs, and express sympathy of Legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Nickey Browning [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |