MS SC599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2019 Mississippi Prudential Spirit Of Community Award Winners: Joseph Voynik (state Honoree), Keegan Figueroa (state Honoree), Annabelle Bunch (distinguished Finalist), Shelby Cooper (distinguished Finalist), Hayes Lesyer (distinguished Finalist), And Marlie Mcclung (distinguished Finalist).
Title
Commend State Honorees and Distinguished Finalists for the 2019 Mississippi Prudential Spirit of Community Award.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] | Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |