MS SC599 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Legacy Of Public Service Of Julia Shaw Green Of Nesbit, Mississippi, Respected Teacher And Congressional Constituent Liaison For Mississippi Senator Roger Wicker.
Title
Commend legacy of public service of respected Congressional Constituent Liaison Julia Shaw Green.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |