MS SC596 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Belmont High School "cardinals" Boys Golf Team And Coach Jason Coker For Winning Their First 2021 Mhsaa 3a State Championship In 15 Years.
Title
Commend Belmont High School "Cardinals" Boys Golf Team for winning 2021 MHSAA 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |