MS SC596 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Applying To The Congress Of The United States To Call An Amendment Convention Of The States Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Constitutional Amendment Convention of the States under Article V; apply for certain restraints on federal government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 69 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-27HouseAdopted
2019-03-27HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-03-22HouseReferred To Rules
2019-03-22SenateTransmitted To House
2019-03-21SenateAdopted
2019-03-21SenateAmendment Failed
2019-03-19SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-18SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SC/SC0596.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SC/SC0596IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SC/SC0596PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SC/SC0596SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SC0596_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SC0596_S_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SC0596_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SC0596_H_Amend_02.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0730025.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0790065.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback