MS SC596 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Recognize And Commend The Historical Development Of The Mississippi Supreme Court And Its Supervision Of The Practice Of Law In Mississippi On The Occasion Of The Celebration Of The Bicentennial Anniversary Of Statehood.
Title
Recognize the historical development of the Mississippi Supreme Court on the occasion of the Bicentennial of Statehood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |