MS SC596 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Callaway High School "chargers" Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach Wayne Brent For Winning Their Fourth Class 5a State Championship In 5 Years And For Their No. 1 Ranking.
Title
Commend Callaway High School "Chargers" Boys Basketball Team for second straight Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |