MS SC595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Accomplishments Of Excellence And Awards Earned By The Mississippi School Of The Arts In Brookhaven, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of Its 15th Anniversary.
Title
Recognize accomplishments of the Mississippi School of the Arts on the occasion of its 15th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |