MS SC595 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Mississippi Industries For The Blind For 75 Years Of Service To The State Of Mississippi And Commending Executive Director Michael Chew.
Title
Recognize Mississippi Industries for the Blind and Executive Director Michael Chew.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |