MS SC587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Judicial Service Of Honorable Clare Sekul Hornsby Of Biloxi, Mississippi, And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature.
Title
Extend condolences of the Legislature and commend judicial service of Honorable Clare Sekul Hornsby.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |