MS SC584 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Recognition Of The Mississippi Legislature To Lucy Richardson Janoush As Recipient Of The 2017 Governor's Arts Award For Leadership As An Arts Patron.
Title
Recognize Lucy Richardson Janoush as recipient of the 2017 Governor's Arts Award for Leadership as an Arts Patron.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |