MS SC584 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Public Service Of Former Mississippi Senator Robert Lacey Crook.
Title
Mourn the loss and commend public service of former Mississippi Senator Robert L. Crook.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-01 | Adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-27 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-27 | Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Referred To Rules |