MS SC584 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Three University Basketball Coaches From Louisville, Mississippi, Who Are Currently Coaching In The Southeastern Conference (sec).
Title
Recognize the three university basketball coaches from Louisville, Mississippi, currently coaching in the SEC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-03 | Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-28 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted | |
2010-01-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Rules |