MS SC583 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Legacy And Distinguished Legal Career Of Circuit Court District Judge Marcus D. Gordon, Mississippi's Longest-serving Trial Court Judge Who Presided Over Historic Mississippi Civil Rights Criminal Cases, And Expressing Belated Condolences To His Surviving Family.
Title
Remember the legacy and distinguished legal career of Mississippi's longest-serving Trial Court Judge, Marcus D. Gordon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-01 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |