MS SC582 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Saluting And Memorializing The Generation Of Businessmen And Community Leaders That Established A Vibrant Automotive Marketplace In Jackson, Mississippi, Following World War Ii And The African American Legends And Success Stories In The Automotive Business In This Market During The Early 1970s And Their Civic Contributions.
Title
Salute the early auto dealers and African American legends of the automobile industry in Jackson, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |