MS SC582 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Outstanding Women's Tennis Legacy Of Natchez Native Weenonah Montgomery Dearing Upon The Occasion Of Her Induction Into The Delta State University Sports Hall Of Fame.
Title
Recognize Women's Tennis Legacy of Weenonah Montgomery Dearing upon her induction into the DSU Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |